PAWPRINTS DOG RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All of the dogs in our care have been rescued from local pounds and undergo assessment prior to rehoming. All dogs are vaccinated, microchipped, wormed, flead and neutered. We also assist Social Services in our local area when a dog must be rehomed due to illness or because owner is deceased. We also offer help to local vets where stray dogs have been injured or are sick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 23 November 2012: Standard registration
- 26 October 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1190250 PAWPRINTS DOG RESCUE
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.41k | £167.24k | £190.46k | £190.23k | £198.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.09k | £121.00k | £131.64k | £132.61k | £183.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | £971 | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 11 September 2019 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 11 September 2019 | 11 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 31 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | 31 August 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/09/2012
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. 2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window