Governing document CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY CHURCH (WALES)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2014 as amended on 14 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROPAGATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO SPREAD THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AS REVEALED THROUGH THE HOLY SCRIPTURES BY MEANS OF COMMUNICATION,WHETHER VISUAL,VERBAL OR WRITTEN.TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELEIVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS,GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND,INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUCH PASTORAL CARE AND SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.