MIKE NIGHTINGALE FELLOWSHIP CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to ?Change Lives Through Sustainable Development?. The charity is presently active in South Africa, where it is leading or contributing to a number of projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- South Africa
Governance
- 10 May 2013: Standard registration
- 16 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- MIKE NIGHTINGALE FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.83k | £15.77k | £15.60k | £10.50k | £7.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.44k | £24.55k | £15.87k | £15.82k | £28.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED ON 07/05/2013
Charitable objects
“TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. ·SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window