CENTREPEACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CentrePeace has established a drop-in community support centre that promotes community cohesion and wellbeing through connecting people with services, resources and social networks in their own community. CentrePeace offers a range of free services, from counselling and support groups to skills and craft workshops. The premises includes a charity shop and cafe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Torbay
Governance
- 05 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey White | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Darren Michael Mulhall | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Harvey | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Helen Gillespie | Trustee | 16 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
LISA ANN EMBERSON | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Jane Emberson | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.01k | £107.63k | £105.70k | £127.78k | £158.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.59k | £109.28k | £96.29k | £141.62k | £162.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £14.07k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN PAIGNTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF PAIGNTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Centrepeace
56 Palace Avenue
Paignton
TQ3 3HF
- Phone:
- 01803550720
- Email:
- info@centrepeace.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window