Financial history THE FUNDING EXCHANGE

Charity number: 1151352
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £5.00k £9.04k £9.32k £7.20k £30.91k
Total expenditure £4.00k £4.01k £3.71k £8.40k £29.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0