Trustees COLEHILL COMMUNITY LIBRARY LIMITED
Charity Number: 1151552

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Gunovsky | Chair | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Mortimer | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Saville Foot | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth John Redman | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Rosemary Holman | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY TERESA REDMAN | Trustee | 06 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.