ST.NEOTS EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to freely share the good news of the Christian faith with all people in St. Neots and the surrounding area, with a desire to see people become disciples of Jesus Christ and grow in their faith in him. Regular activities include: sunday services, homegroups, ladies Bible studies, parent & toddler's, children & youth groups, elderly ministry, prison ministry, evangelistic events & courses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 14 January 2013: Standard registration
- SNEC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF SELLEY | Chair | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Jonathan Andrew Bennett | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Jonathan Mark Slater | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD ERIC GODFREY VENNELLE | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
MIKE KENDALL | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.72k | £215.51k | £249.62k | £247.63k | £258.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.74k | £194.98k | £220.47k | £254.69k | £258.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH SHALL BE:-(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN ST NEOTS, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES IN CONSULTATION WITH THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
ST NEOTS, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Neots Evangelical Church
Cambridge Street
ST. NEOTS
PE19 1PL
- Phone:
- 01480 405839
- Email:
- admin@snec.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window