SHAKESPEARE LIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the dramatic arts for the public benefit by producing high quality productions of plays from the Jacobean period and to advance education in all aspects of the performing arts,in particular but not exclusively for young people. Currently ,once a year, for one week we perform an outdoor production of Shakespeare at Lackham House Lacock Wiltshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
- Swindon
- Warwickshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Horrex | Chair | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Wilson | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cork | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Kerensa McCondach | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Isabel Hume | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jude Bucklow | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Fowlds | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM FORESTER-PATON | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILL MORRELL | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN MORRELL | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PENNY CLEGG | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.75k | £28.70k | £27.54k | £31.20k | £24.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.01k | £25.05k | £26.42k | £27.50k | £29.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 07/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DRAMATIC ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PRODUCING HIGH QUALITY PRODUCTIONS OF PLAYS FROM THE ELIZABETHAN AND JACOBEAN PERIOD AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE PERFORMING ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 WINSLEY HILL
LIMPLEY STOKE
BATH
BA2 7FA
- Phone:
- 07788842204
- Email:
- shakespearelive@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window