Financial history THE LONDON KURDISH FILM FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1152981
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2019 01/07/2020 01/07/2021 01/07/2022 01/07/2023
Total gross income £2.75k £24.86k £21.91k £6.39k £30.21k
Total expenditure £2.42k £7.49k £25.26k £5.23k £27.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A