Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD CITY OF ZION

Charity number: 1152166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £73.26k £68.08k £141.45k £135.71k £168.82k
Total expenditure £65.11k £62.84k £85.87k £135.28k £125.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A