Financial history THE AVRO HERITAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1150163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £165.03k £166.09k £180.41k £238.32k £252.85k
Total expenditure £161.46k £61.78k £118.79k £228.60k £196.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A