Trustees HALCYON LONDON INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL
Charity number: 1150105

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RITA HALBRIGHT | Chair | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alexia PHILLIPS | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eliyao HAROUSH | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Satoko JENKINS | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dipali SAHNI | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally THOROGOOD | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cutbill | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MATTHAEUS | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ACHIM BECK | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SEARS | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.