NEW HOPE WORCESTERSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief to children and young adults under the age of 19 with a mental and/or physical disability and who are resident in Worcestershire, Herefordshire or Gloucestershire, to alleviate the effect of disability on such children and their carers and/or families, and to advance the education of such children and to relieve in cases of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Catherine Sloane | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LUCY HODGSON | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEAN WILSON | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HOWARTH | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Elaine Rabbetts | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Judith Doreen Owen | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.63k | £24.67k | £29.90k | £44.45k | £56.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.89k | £23.34k | £45.63k | £31.51k | £55.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 19 WITH A MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN WORCESTERSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE OR GLOUCESTERSHIRE, TO ALLEVIATE THE EFFECT OF DISABILITY ON SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR CARERS AND/OR FAMILIES, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN; AND TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 19 RESIDENT IN WORCESTERSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE OR GLOUCESTERSHIRE, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 WELLS ROAD
WORCESTER
WR5 1NN
- Phone:
- 01905355295
- Email:
- JEAN.WILSON46@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
newhopeworcester.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window