HELP HUMANITY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and vocational training of the underprivileged, empowering women and providing medical aid support to the poor in Pakistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hillingdon
- Pakistan
Governance
- 21 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAZIA HASAN | Chair | 07 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Arfan Ahmad | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ATIYA SAITHNA | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED FIAZ CHOUDHARY | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr REHAN AHMED | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
BUSHRA ZAFAR | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD AZHAR | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR FARHANA AKBAR PHD | Trustee | 07 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.56k | £13.86k | £10.80k | £23.27k | £17.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £677 | £1.87k | £3.00k | £45.79k | £8.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/08/2012 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:(A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY;(B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION;(C)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH;(D)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY(OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE)FOR PERSONS,BODIES,ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED (INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID)
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Ducks Hill Road
NORTHWOOD
1 Bluebell House
HA6 2SQ
- Phone:
- 01923827518
- Email:
- helphumanityuk@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window