THE SUITED & BOOTED CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides those referred by public agencies with suitable (donated) interview clothing, with general mentoring and in some cases with opportunities for work experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 October 2012: Standard registration
- SUITED & BOOTED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGUS MURRAY | Chair | 21 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Enid Lawson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Booth | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.23k | £151.86k | £88.31k | £151.71k | £183.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.80k | £116.67k | £148.12k | £121.67k | £120.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT AND ASSISTANCE TO THOSE RECENTLY BACK TO WORK OR IN LOW-PAID INSECURE WORK AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF LONDON, THE NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS OF INNER LONDON (CAMDEN, GREENWICH, HACKNEY, HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM, ISLINGTON, KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA, LAMBETH, LEWISHAM, SOUTHWARK, TOWER HAMLETS, WANDSWORTH AND WESTMINSTER), AND THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN DISCHARGED FROM THE ARMED SERVICES OR ARE PRISONERS OR FORMER PRISONERS OR WHO ARE VULNERABLE BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OF BODY OR MIND, OR DISABLEMENT, INCLUDING ADDICTION AND HIV/ AIDS, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION OR BEING LONG-TERM UNEMPLOYED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 4
HUDSON BUILDING
11 CHICKSAND STREET
LONDON
E1 5LD
- Phone:
- 07808531654
- Email:
- suitedbootedcentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window