WICKFORD TOWN F.C.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Charter Standard Community Development Club and Registered Charity, providing safe football in the Community. Wickford Town Football Club has been providing football in Wickford from 1969.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 02 November 2012: Standard registration
- WTFC (Working name)
- WICKFORD TOWN YOUTH F.C. (Previous name)
- WTYFC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE LODGE | Chair | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Bartlett | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Payne | Trustee | 21 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK NELLER | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.06k | £96.07k | £142.85k | £213.59k | £144.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.36k | £88.22k | £142.26k | £164.92k | £213.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 AUG 1987 AS AMENDED ON 25/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL IN A MANAGED AND SAFE ENVIRONMENT, PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATION AND COMPETITION FOR ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wickford Town FC
Bartlett Park
Wickford
Essex
SS11 8RZ
- Phone:
- 07775871977
- Email:
- committee@wickfordtown.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window