Accounts and annual returns GAROODI WOMEN DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION(CHARITY)

Charity Number: 1151776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 May 2024 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 May 2022 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 June 2021 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required