STOW MARIES GREAT WAR AERODROME LTD

Charity Number: 1151099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Preservation of Stow Maries Great War Aerodrome

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £251,268
Total expenditure: £284,770

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 March 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Macgowan OBE Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Anthony John McQuiggan Trustee 28 November 2023
ANN JOHNSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GALLEYWOOD HERITAGE CENTRE
Received: On time
Martyn John Gill Trustee 25 January 2023
WIVENHOE FILM THEATRE
Received: On time
David Mack FCMA,CGMA Trustee 24 August 2022
None on record
Penelope Anne Johnson Trustee 23 January 2020
None on record
JOHN FRANCIS ALDRIDGE Trustee 18 January 2019
ESSEX SHIRE HALL TRUST
Received: 10 days late
THE KING EDWARD VI'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL AT CHELMSFORD FOUNDATION
Recently registered
THE MONSIGNOR WILSON MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
KING EDWARD VI'S SCHOOL AT CHELMSFORD
Received: On time
THE CANON HOLMES MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
OPEN ROAD VISIONS
Received: On time
SARAH JANE THRELFALL Trustee 18 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT WALTHAM WITH FORD END
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £281.57k £288.50k £216.02k £177.97k £251.27k
Total expenditure £424.93k £292.04k £269.81k £277.16k £284.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.37k £166.58k £21.19k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 March 2023 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 March 2023 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hackman's Lane
Purleigh
Chelmsford
Essex
CM3 6RN
Phone:
07944 292052