MACDONALD UK OBSTETRIC MEDICINE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of medical, midwiery and scientific personel with regardto medical problems in pregnancy. Promotion of healthyoutcomes for all pregnant women with medical disorders
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 October 2013: Standard registration
- MOMS (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paarul Prinja | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Frise | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy Mackillop | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.77k | £14.82k | £18.44k | £14.26k | £47.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.83k | £3.33k | £6.02k | £20.87k | £26.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 August 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROMOTING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE THE EDUCATION OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS, THOSE IN TRAINING TO BECOME HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS AND SCIENTISTS WORKING IN THE FIELD OF OBSTETRIC MEDICINE IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: 2.1 PROVIDING A NATIONAL FORUM FOR DOCTORS INVOLVED IN THE CARE OF MEDICAL PROBLEMS DURING PREGNANCY TO PRESENT CLINICAL AND BASIC SCIENCE RESEARCH FOR DISCUSSION AND CRITICAL EVALUATION; 2.2 PROVIDING A NATIONAL FORUM FOR ACADEMIC INTERACTION BETWEEN, OBSTETRICIANS, PHYSICIANS, SCIENTISTS, ANAESTHETISTS, AND OTHER RELATED PROFESSIONALS; 2.3 PROMOTING RESEARCH INTERESTS IN OBSTETRIC MEDICINE AND COLLABORATIVE RESEARCH ACTIVITY; 2.4 PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF GUIDELINES FOR TRAINING OBSETETRICIANS AND PHYSICIANS IN MEDICAL COMPLICATIONS OF PREGNANCY; 2.5 PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMS TO FURTHER NATIONAL AND REGIONAL EXPERTISE IN THE AREA OF MEDICAL PROBLEMS IN PREGNANCY; 2.6 ENCOURAGING OBSTETRIC MEDICINE CURRICULUM DEVELOPMENT AT UNDERGRADUATE, GRADUATE AND POST-GRADUATE LEVELS; 2.7 FOSTERING THE CREATION OF CRITERIA FOR THE RECOGNITION OF SPECIAL COMPETENCE IN THE AREA OF OBSTETRIC MEDICINE; PROVIDED THAT THE SOCIETY SHALL ENSURE THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY RESEARCH THAT IT HAS FACILITATED OR FUNDED SHALL BE PUBLISHED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Women's Centre
John Radcliffe Hospital
Headington
Oxford
Oxfordshire
OX3 9DU
- Phone:
- 07825517546
- Email:
- Lucy.Mackillop@ouh.nhs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window