SPRINGFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (NORTH TYNESIDE) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Forest Hall and surrounding areas without distinction of age, sex or of political or religious opinions by associating statutory authorities, voluntary organisations, local businesses and inhabitants in a common effort to improve facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure to improve conditions for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 13 November 2012: Standard registration
- SCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Hogg | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antony Curry | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kelly | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mary Boyd | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Lesley Simm | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Hill | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ERIC STYAN | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Linda Hoffman | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.39k | £39.70k | £54.39k | £48.41k | £68.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.99k | £29.64k | £40.84k | £58.84k | £64.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.05k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FOREST HALL AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, LOCAL BUSINESSES AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IMPROVE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 PARK DRIVE
FOREST HALL
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE12 9JP
- Phone:
- 01912662988
- Website:
-
springfieldcommunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window