COMMUNITY AGAINST POVERTY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(2) To advance the education of the public, in particular but not exclusively by the provisionof language and other classes in the UK (3) The relief of unemployment for the benefit of the public in such ways as may be thought fit (4) The relief of sickness and preservation of health in particular (5) To provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 07 December 2012: Standard registration
- CAP FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samad Muhammad Abdus | Chair | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ammar Monojir | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alom Rouf | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|||||
ABDUL NOOR | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.88k | £441.58k | £370.08k | £412.17k | £494.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £311.54k | £366.81k | £388.14k | £426.62k | £404.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2012 as amended on 10 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UK AND ASIA, IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE OF DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WHO ARE IN HARDSHIP; 1. TO PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, YOUTH OR POVERTY. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND OTHER CLASSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD. 3. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. 4. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG WIDOWS AND ORPHANS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD 5. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greatorex Business Centre
7-15 Greatorex Street
LONDON
E1 5NF
- Phone:
- 02031373105
- Email:
- info@capfoundations.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window