Financial history HAREHILLS LANE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1149238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £101.45k £74.37k £89.76k £122.03k £282.63k
Total expenditure £97.49k £90.08k £87.29k £84.98k £95.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.60k