VENUS & CUPID ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In Morecambe To: 1.acquire finance/maintain/repair/secure for the public benefit the sculpture Venus & Cupid and other public art works/projects; 2. purchase/commission public art works/projects/events; 3. facilitate education in the arts and associated skills and the development of artistic skills among unemployed or socially and economically disadvantaged young people, by local fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 22 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHRYN MACDONALD | Chair | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ANDERSON | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|||||
SIAN JOHNSON MA OXON | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
COLIN ANTHONY BROWN | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09k | £26.32k | £710 | £560 | £378 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.95k | £2.73k | £2.52k | £4.68k | £1.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 August 2022 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 August 2022 | 211 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY (‘THE OBJECT’) IS: TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC’S APPRECIATION OF AND EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THAT OF THE ART OF SCULPTURE BY ACQUIRING AND MAINTAINING THE SCULPTURE KNOWN AS VENUS AND CUPID IN MORECAMBE AND TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES IN RELATION TO THE ARTS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- 1.TO ACQUIRE FINANCE MAINTAIN REPAIR AND SECURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE SCULPTURE KNOWN AS VENUS & CUPID AND OTHER PUBLIC ART WORKS AND PROJECTS IN MORECAMBE; 2. TO PURCHASE AND COMMISSION PUBLIC ART WORKS PROJECTS AND EVENTS IN MORECAMBE; AND 3.TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND ASSOCIATED SKILLS IN MORECAMBE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC SKILLS AMONG UNEMPLOYED OR SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE.[FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, MORECAMBE SHALL BE CONSIDERED TO INCLUDE THE ELECTORAL WARDS OF BARE, HARBOUR, POULTON, TORRISHOLME, WESTGATE HEYSHAM WITH THE ADDITION OF HEST BANK ALL AS DEFINED AT THE DATE OF THE DECLARATION OF THIS DEED.][NOTHING IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Area of benefit
MORECAMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
336 Marine Road Central
Morecambe
LA4 5AB
- Phone:
- 07711066589
- Email:
- sian@sja.uk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window