FRIENDS OF CHESTNUT GROVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Refreshments for all the Open Evenings and Parents Evening 2. Refreshments and raffles at all school Concerts and end of term Productions 3. Support the school when they organise specific events 4. Comedy Fund-raising event to raise money for the an African School the School supports and to send a group of 6th Formers on a house building project to Cambodia 5. Donation of 4 outdoor benches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 04 January 2013: Standard registration
- FOCG (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Miles Hackwell | Chair | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Richard Cowley | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Noble | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Debby Sinarahua Nelmes | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.59k | £29.41k | £24.63k | £8.62k | £11.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.84k | £2.96k | £34.17k | £15.62k | £6.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 September 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chestnut Grove Academy - Friends of Chestnut Grove
45 Chestnut Grove
BALHAM
SW12 8JZ
- Phone:
- 07427352024
- Email:
- friends@chestnutgrove.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window