ABRAHAM'S SEED

Charity Number: 1149459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity has been actively involved in raising awareness of the issues affecting vulnerable children in Cote D'Ivoire building relationship with a school in Zikisso and an orphanage in the Dimbokro and collecting clothes, toys, shoes and other items to ship to the organisations on the ground. The organisation has also recruited volunteers in Coventry to organise and run fundraising events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £5,225
Total expenditure: £4,090

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City
  • Throughout London
  • Ivory Coast

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • AS Charity Awards (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICIA DJOUKOUHO DAGO EP LOHORE Chair 27 September 2012
None on record
AKPA JEAN FULGENCE LATTE Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Cecile Mevel Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
JOY NGOMBE KUKATULA Trustee 27 September 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £1.80k £2.40k £3.01k £5.05k £5.23k
Total expenditure £1.76k £2.19k £2.90k £3.98k £4.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 20 February 2025 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 29 February 2024 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 25 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 06 March 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
42 DONCASTER CLOSE
COVENTRY
CV2 1HX
Phone:
07428150352