SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES POLO LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision or assistance in the provision of facilities to enable and encourage the playing of polo amongst children and young persons who are in full-time education at any school or university thereby assisting to ensure that due attention is given to the physical education and development of such persons as well as to the occupation and development of their minds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 December 2012: Standard registration
- SUPA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Mercer | Chair | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Annette Gordon | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Bradshaw | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.41k | £35.48k | £137.41k | £134.60k | £127.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.89k | £32.04k | £131.77k | £140.63k | £145.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 January 2025 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 March 2025 | 278 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2025 | 604 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 05 March 2025 | 644 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 January 2025 | 969 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 March 2025 | 1009 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE THE PLAYING OF POLO AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE IN FULL-TIME EDUCATION AT ANY SCHOOL OR UNIVERSITY THEREBY ASSISTING TO ENSURE THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PERSONS AS WELL AS TO THE OCCUPATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR MINDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Woodside Road
Amersham
Bucks
HP6 6AA
- Phone:
- 01494873322
- Email:
- chairman@supa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window