CHEBSEY PARISH HALL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a public facility where the local community can come together regardless of age, gender or social economic status.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 18 December 2012: Standard registration
- CHEBSEY VILLAGE HALL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA CLAIRE DOBSON | Chair | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH EDGE | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Matthew Dobson | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA HUBER | Trustee | 10 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY BRYAN GOLDTHORPE | Trustee | 30 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MICHAEL CARR | Trustee | 30 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.60k | £11.33k | £29.17k | £5.25k | £2.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.94k | £1.46k | £3.19k | £9.16k | £9.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £29.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/03/2015
Charitable objects
(I)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHEBSEY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND(II)TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A VILLAGE HALL AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY)IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CHEBSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tinkers Butt
Park Lane
Chebsey
Stafford
Staffs
ST21 6JU
- Phone:
- 07855821493
- Email:
- chebseyparishhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
chebseyparishhall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window