Financial history SUFFOLK CHRISTIAN CAMPS

Charity number: 1150005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £32.02k £4.83k £15.77k £32.57k £33.15k
Total expenditure £34.26k £6.94k £16.85k £28.93k £30.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A