SUFFOLK CHRISTIAN CAMPS

Charity number: 1150005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's activities are centred upon the provision of Christian Camps. The charity's activities are centred on a camp site, which is included within the grounds of Sizewell Hall Christian Conference centre, a separate, completely independent charity. A representative (usually the Sizewell Hall manager) is appointed to the committee to represent, and to liaise between the two charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £33,149
Total expenditure: £30,877

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Henry Philip Matter Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
James Golding Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
RACHAEL BARBARA WALLACE Trustee 18 October 2012
None on record
ANTHONY WILLIAM HOOD Trustee 18 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £32.02k £4.83k £15.77k £32.57k £33.15k
Total expenditure £34.26k £6.94k £16.85k £28.93k £30.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 02 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 02 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 23 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
44 OAKEY FIELD ROAD
THURSTON
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP31 3RX
Phone:
01359231084