Financial history GUBA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.11k £46.42k £10.12k £5.59k £22.80k
Total expenditure £6.39k £51.90k £8.52k £1.79k £7.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A