ST JOHNS METHODIST CHURCH SUDBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 The furtherance of God's work in Sudbury and surrounding area 2 Propagation of the Christian faith. 3 Providing and supporting positive opportunities for the development of activities to benefit the whole community. 4 To work constructively with other churches of other denominations. 5 Provide worship opportunities for all ages and a welcoming atmosphere for all, especially newcomers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £70,600 from 3 government grant(s)
People

22 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 March 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHNS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jason Christopher Vinyard | Chair | 04 November 2021 |
|
|||||
John Simon Willis | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH BROOKER | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Reed | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Norma Phyllis Newcomb BA Hons | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MARGARET RIX | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV RUTH KAREN RIDGE | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Rita Andrea Carr | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue Rampling | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|||||
PHILIP RICHARDSON | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ISABEL MARY HEBDEN | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|||||
SUSAN PUGH BA, PGCE | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE ELIZABETH BADRICK | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GEORGE STANFORD | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN HEARN | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE WILLIS BA HONS | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR PAUL MARTLAND | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN PLATTEN | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER GODFREY RIX | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN DOREEN SMYTHE BA HONS | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
SIMON FRANCIS CHARLES BADRICK ACA | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.26k | £159.41k | £135.81k | £170.09k | £198.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.63k | £144.42k | £139.83k | £172.65k | £198.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £67.10k | £82.89k | N/A | £72.87k | £70.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Windsor Green
Cockfield
Bury St Edmunds
Suffolk
IP30 0LY
- Phone:
- 01787311805
- Email:
- admin@stjohns-sudbury.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window