NOT JUST SUNDAES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A community Centre, community cafe and ice cream parlour, and youth centre/drop in for young people located in Wareham Dorset. BH20 4LU
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 17 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Gould | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Goodinge | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Laking | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES FOYLE | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA MARY SPILLER | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brett Spiller | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.76k | £26.56k | £30.48k | £38.44k | £30.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.07k | £29.75k | £29.76k | £39.35k | £37.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/12/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/01/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WAREHAM, DORSET, AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 2) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 3) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND THAT DEMONSTRATE GOD'S LOVE FOR ALL WITHIN A CHRISTIAN FRAMEWORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Street
Wareham
Dorset
BH20 4LU
- Phone:
- 01929 553223
- Email:
- debsbarclay19@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window