Accounts and annual returns INDEPENDENT CINEMA MILTON KEYNES (ICMK) LIMITED
Charity number: 1149744
Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2019 | 07 August 2020 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 296 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2018 | 07 August 2020 | 435 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2018 | 22 March 2021 | 662 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window