INDEPENDENT CINEMA MILTON KEYNES (ICMK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent Cinema MK primarily works in Milton Keynes. ICMK runs a variety of film screening and education projects benefiting the cultural development of the the city and enabling people in the city to engage with a wider variety of film and artistic experiences. ICMK works in partnership with a variety of organisations and groups in the city from grassroots to lead cultural bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 13 November 2012: Standard registration
- ICMK (Working name)
- INDEPENDENT CINEMA MK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Davin Jeayes | Chair | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anna Dixon | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ARMES | Trustee | 12 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2017 | 30/07/2018 | 30/07/2019 | 30/07/2020 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.91k | £61.05k | £27.16k | £3.69k | £4.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.89k | £44.29k | £41.15k | £4.28k | £5.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £4.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 523 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 523 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2019 | 07 August 2020 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 296 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/05/2012
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF FILM; AND B TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE A NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOWN HALL
CREED STREET
WOLVERTON
MILTON KEYNES
MK12 5LY
- Phone:
- 07922891644
- Email:
- hello@vagabond.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window