THE APRIROSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the period the organisation endeavoured to support such charitable causes that would further the objects of the puposes for which the chairty was set up. Support was given to various causes/charities that assist children's health and education and community centres that help the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
Governance
- 01 November 2012: Standard registration
- THE APROROSE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MANSUKH GUDKA | Chair | 02 October 2012 |
|
|||||
MANISH GUDKA | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|||||
PARAG GUDKA | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.98k | £3.76k | £100.78k | £3.13k | £10.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.52k | £10.00k | £237.34k | £112.92k | £60.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AND/OR THE SUPPORT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME SELECT, AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
BARNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aprirose
88 Baker Street
LONDON
W1U 6TQ
- Phone:
- 02089510377
- Email:
- mansukh@aprirose.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window