Financial history THE KAYS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1149856
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.22m £1.77m £2.20m £1.10m £1.18m
Total expenditure £1.58m £1.04m £1.02m £1.24m £1.33m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.22m £1.77m £0 £1.10m £1.18m
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.20m £0 £46
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £746.24k £690.25k £774.60k £988.32k £1.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £831.77k £352.97k £248.35k £249.95k £334.58k
Expenditure - Governance £92.20k £97.52k £96.45k £113.69k £138.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £205.92k £265.62k £291.73k £609.16k £150.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £506.94k £53.77k £25.52k £1.43k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0