ABBOTS LANGLEY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing live music to area in which Abbots Langley Orchestra operates under the aegis of a professional conductor and using mainly professional soloists to give audience best experience. To give orchestra members opportunity of playing solo in concertos. Short talks on structure and context given before each piece. ALO expands its repertoire by undertaking contemporary or rarely performed works
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 November 2012: Standard registration
- ALO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raphael Mark Sofair | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Diane Simon | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR VIJITA NIKAPOTA | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|||||
LYNNE WATKINS | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | 30/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.81k | £3.27k | £7.22k | £9.90k | £9.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.11k | £4.00k | £7.94k | £8.10k | £9.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Liverpool Road
WATFORD
WD18 0DW
- Phone:
- 07941206268
- Email:
- NELLSIMON1685@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window