MACCLESFIELD BARNABY FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity organises the annual Barnaby festival in Macclesfield which entails the provision of public events , including performances, exhibitions , workshops, talks and such other means as the trustees may decide
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 September 2023
Total income includes £16,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
77 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 08 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Todd | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Lomas | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Marsden | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
NIgel Bradley | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/09/2019 | 29/09/2020 | 29/09/2021 | 29/09/2022 | 29/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.70k | £107.50k | £39.81k | £14.83k | £16.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.30k | £63.02k | £80.42k | £13.03k | £24.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.50k | £10.00k | £26.50k | £14.32k | £16.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 September 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, SCIENCES AND THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF MACCLESFIELD BY THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC EVENTS, INCLUDING PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS, WORKSHOPS, TALKS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waters Green House
Sunderland Street
Macclesfield
SK11 6LF
- Phone:
- 08458620015
- Email:
- mail@barnabyfestival.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window