FRINTON GOSPEL CHAPEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds have been collected and given out throughout the year to support Christian Organisations, Missionary Societies, and individuals engaged in spreading the Gospel of Jesus Christ. Outreach into Schools. Clubs run for children. Public Services have been held each Sunday. Holding Services in Residential Homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- Central African Republic
- Colombia
- Ecuador
- Indonesia
- Ukraine
Governance
- 04 February 2013: Standard registration
- FGC TRUST OR FGCT (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GEORGE DAY | Chair | 10 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Massey | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Julie Claxton | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ian Smith | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN MASSEY | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN JAMES SULLIVAN | Trustee | 10 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CLIFFORD URSELL | Trustee | 10 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.01k | £64.17k | £161.80k | £201.01k | £113.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.35k | £70.66k | £163.57k | £188.08k | £157.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/02/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PRESCHOOL EDUCATION FACILITIES, SUNDAY SCHOOL CLASSES AND DRAMA CLASSES. 3) THE RELIEF OF NEED AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DEBT COUNSELLING SERVICES. 4) TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 OLD ROAD
FRINTON-ON-SEA
ESSEX
CO13 9BY
- Phone:
- 07840 989862
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window