HODAN SOMALI COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? drop in advice and information service ? outreach advice, advocacy and information service ?Steps into employment project ? Health empowerment and engagement club for women ? networking and learning sessions ? Elders support programme ? Participation in local voluntary and statutory sector fora and consultations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £21,550 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Hillingdon
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 07 February 2013: Standard registration
- 03 April 2014: Funds received from 1118588 HODAN SOMALI COMMMUNITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mahdi Abdillahi Ali | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kaltun Ahmed | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shukri Hassan | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Hon | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jama Sahra | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.04k | £150.10k | £139.94k | £117.04k | £158.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.06k | £92.32k | £116.65k | £110.65k | £141.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.24k | £22.68k | £11.34k | £32.51k | £21.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/08/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY LIVING AND/OR WORKING IN KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA AND THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS IN PARTICULAR TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HODAN SOMALI COMMUNITY
CANALSIDE HOUSE
383 LADBROKE GROVE
LONDON
W10 5AA
- Phone:
- 02089605813
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window