THE PTFA OF ST EUGENE DE MAZENOD

Charity number: 1149483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parent fundraising for a primary school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £3,825
Total expenditure: £3,728

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PTFA ST EUGENE DE MAZENOD (Working name)
  • FOR AND ON BEHALF OF PARENTS TEACHERS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Chevailler Chair 09 February 2024
None on record
Siobhan Delaney Trustee 09 February 2024
None on record
Alketa Aykac Trustee 09 February 2024
None on record
Jessica Sullivan-Ankrah Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.50k £3.55k £1.34k £3.00k £3.83k
Total expenditure £3.00k £3.00k £382 £2.37k £3.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 November 2024 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2023 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Eugene De Mazenod School
Mazenod Avenue
LONDON
NW6 4LS
Phone:
07432686150
Website:

No information available