GLOBAIA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote for the public benefit the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment and to advance the education of the public in the understanding of living systems including their impact on the health of the physical and natural world and on humanity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Argentina
- Brazil
- France
- Portugal
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 07 June 2013: Standard registration
- SYNERGETIC FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMAR ALEXANDER FAYED | Chair | 21 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Felix Pharand - Deschenes | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Manno Franca | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.25k | £7.92k | £8.48k | £8.05k | £8.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- (1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN FIELDS RELATED TO UNDERSTANDING AND WORKING WITH THE BIOSPHERE (THE EARTH'S SURFACE AND ATMOSPHERE WHICH IS INHABITED BY LIVING ECO-SYSTEMS)AND ECOTECHNICS (THE TECHNICS OF ECOLOGY AND THE ECOLOGY OF TECHNICS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Synergy House
114-118 Southampton Row
London
London
WC1B 5AA
- Phone:
- 02075769466
- Email:
- mitch@synergeticmgt.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window