THE ASSOCIATION OF WOODTURNERS OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is membership organisation, with aims to promote the craft of woodturning, to raise appreciation of the creativity, skill and heritage of woodturning. The charity also aims to advance the education of the public in the craft and skill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 December 2012: Standard registration
- AWGB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Ian Peers | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Montgomery | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chris Parker | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eddie Elliott | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven James Gordon | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Fisher | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Hughes | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Barry Wilson | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev George Hutchinson Rogers | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Masuma Rahim | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Anne Whitaker | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Patrick Milham | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Henry Peachey | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey John Belcher | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.25k | £99.11k | £68.20k | £74.13k | £72.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.28k | £76.80k | £81.85k | £86.52k | £82.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE CRAFT OF WOODTURNING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN DOING SO RAISE APPRECIATION OF THE CREATIVITY, SKILL AND HERITAGE OF WOODTURNING 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CRAFT AND SKILL OF WOODTURNING
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 St. Georges Avenue
Westhoughton
BOLTON
BL5 2EZ
- Phone:
- 07802916967
- Email:
- chairman@awgb.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window