ORDER OF SAINT LAZARUS, GRAND PRIORY OF GREAT BRITAIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1150392
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives are: Relief of persons suffering from Hansens Disease (leprosy) Relief of the poor and most disadvantaged Support of Hospices within the UK Support of education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022

Total income: £5,512
Total expenditure: £9,858

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Sri Lanka

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 January 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OSLJGB CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Hackett Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Patricia McGrath Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Rev Mark Lawler BA STB Trustee 26 November 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £19.24k £38.23k £20.70k £5.94k £5.51k
Total expenditure £45.06k £18.43k £21.91k £13.13k £9.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 104
Staith Court
8 Nicholson Square
LONDON
E3 3UE
Phone:
07513547214
Email:
No information available