AL-REHMAT ISLAMIC FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness and promote good health for the benefit of the public in Sharaqpur, Sheikhupura, in the Punjab province of Pakistan by the provision of support and funding to the Shifa Ur Rehman hospital. To advance the education in particular but not exclusively of young children in the area of benefit by the provision of funding and supplies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Manchester City
- Pakistan
Governance
- 22 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD HABIB-UR RAHMAN | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ZAKIRA SAUD | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ZAFAR IQBAL | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
HAFIZ HAMOOD UR REHMAN | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Naeem Ur Rehman | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.00k | £4.54k | £4.42k | £4.50k | £3.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £60 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/03/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SHARAQPUR, SHEIKHUPURA, IN THE PUNJAB PROVINCE OF PAKISTAN BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND FUNDING TO THE SHIFA UR REHMAN HOSPITAL. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF YOUNG CHILDREN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND SUPPLIES. 3. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Skelton Grove
Longsight
Manchester
M13 0UL
- Phone:
- 07852207409
- Email:
- tayyab@fergusonandco.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window