TARIKI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the development of Buddhist culture, Buddhist psychology, and Buddhist psychotherapy, appropriate to the contemporary world. To support Dharma practitioners and Dharma students. To sponsor the training of individuals in the spiritual, psychological and practical skills necessary to actualise the principles of compassion, wisdom and skilful means in the context of contemporary society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Samworth | Chair | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Joanne Sheridan | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hussam Al-Nawab | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELISE TATE | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.02k | £56.81k | £46.89k | £45.53k | £54.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.35k | £39.94k | £45.11k | £34.61k | £39.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 DEC 2011 as amended on 15 Apr 2019 as amended on 15 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION (DHARMA).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pinkerton Cottage
34 Temple
Midlothian
EH23 4SQ
- Phone:
- 01875 830298
- Email:
- courses@tarikitrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window