BRETHREN IN CHRIST CHURCH-MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manchester Brethren In Christ Church is involved in a number of charitable activities. One of the main activities undertaken by the organisation is to provide church services to the community. This is done through preaching and teachings of the Christian way of life as well as through general advice giving.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 29 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Ann Khumalo | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siphilise Loreta Munyaka | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bongani Nkala | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ntando Sibanda | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Promise Ngulube | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Mpofu | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nothando Dube | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev ABSALOM MABHENA | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.92k | £8.71k | £11.55k | £15.15k | £14.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.21k | £3.10k | £5.55k | £13.32k | £15.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2012
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES AND THE MAIN CHURCH COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME MAY DEEM FIT; 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES AND THE MAIN CHURCH COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME MAY DEEM FIT; AND 3.1.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES AND THE MAIN CHURCH COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME MAY DEEM FIT. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES AND THE MAIN CHURCH COMMITTEE MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Buckthorn Lane
BLACKBURN
BB2 5AR
- Phone:
- 01617033715
- Email:
- info@biccmanchester.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window