Financial history LLOYD'S REGISTER INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1151987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.11m £6.42m £11.40m £13.01m £12.38m
Total expenditure £17.84m £5.86m £10.79m £11.50m £11.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £639.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £17.42m £6.40m £11.36m £12.90m £12.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47.00k £23.00k £34.00k £102.00k £300.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.84m £5.86m £10.79m £11.50m £11.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £50.00k £45.00k £47.00k £49.00k £52.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0