THE SMILEY RILEY FUND UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity Ball Funday Sports events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leeds City
Governance
- 14 November 2012: Standard registration
- 09 February 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 March 2015: Re-registered
- 09 February 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/08/2013 | 28/08/2014 | 28/08/2015 | 28/08/2016 | 28/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £9.50k | £9.35k | £9.40k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £6.10k | £1.60k | £3.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2017 | 04 October 2018 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2016 | 06 February 2018 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS')ARE:THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A) TO RELIEVE CHILDREN (AND THEIR FAMILIES) OF THE TRAUMA OF THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CANCER OR BRAIN TUMOURS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT(IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO)THE PROVISION OF TRAVEL EXPENSES TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND HOSPITALS FOR THEIR TREATMENT; B) TO FURTHER THE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF CANCER, ITS TREATMENT AND ITS EFFECTS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THE MARTIN HOUSE CHILDREN'S HOSPICE, BOSTON SPA, WETHERBY LS3 6TX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window