BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION CARDIFF LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity is providing advice and help to Bangladeshis in and around Cardiff in respect of general welfare. This activities are being carried out by the volunteers of the association. Among the activities - working in raising awareness in mainstreaming the community, helping on welfare benefits, organising cultural events and providing administrative assistance to people and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 18 December 2012: Standard registration
- 15 April 2013: Funds received from 1085486 BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION (CARDIFF)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sirajul Islam Chowdhury | Trustee | 26 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mamud Hussain | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rokibur Rahman | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Md Mujibur Rahman | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mokis Monsur Miah | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR Nojir Uddin | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Abdul Hannan | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Keramat Ali | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHEIKH MOHAMMED ANWAR | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ASKOR ALI | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shofique Miah | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2019 | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.68k | £25.81k | £54.85k | £6.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.90k | £4.33k | £16.20k | £26.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 26 April 2023 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | 26 April 2023 | 329 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 14 April 2022 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,PRESERVE AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH,THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 SPLOTT ROAD
CARDIFF
CF24 2DA
- Phone:
- 02920488711
- Email:
- hannan51@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window